skip to content

D'Souza, Mark Joaquim Julius

CPSO#: 91147

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MyomedicalMD
1939 Kennedy Road
Unit 105
Toronto ON  M1P 2L9
Phone: (416) 364-4052
Fax: (416) 364-4423 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

111 Simcoe Street North
Unit 100
Oshawa ON  L1G 4S4
Canada
Phone: 289-316-1645
Fax: 289-316-1647
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mark J.J. D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. D'Souza ( CPSO# 26299 )
Dr. M. D'Souza ( CPSO# 91147 )

Business Address:
MyoMedicalMD
105 - 1939 Kennedy Road
Toronto ON  M1P 2L9
Phone Number: (416) 364-4052

Business Address:
100 - 111 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa ON  L1G 4S4
Phone Number: (289) 316-1715


Corporation Name: Subhra Mohapatra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. D'Souza ( CPSO# 91147 )
Dr. H. Jeyaraj ( CPSO# 86403 )
Dr. K. Efala ( CPSO# 80319 )
Dr. D. D'Souza ( CPSO# 100502)
Dr. S. Mohapatra ( CPSO# 100565)

Business Address:
Myo Medical MD
G1
145 Front Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 364-4052

Business Address:
Suite 105
1939 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Phone Number: (416) 412-0505


Corporation Name: Dr. D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. D'Souza ( CPSO# 91147 )
Dr. K. Efala ( CPSO# 80319 )
Dr. D. D'Souza ( CPSO# 100502)
Dr. S. Mohapatra ( CPSO# 100565)

Business Address:
Suite 100
111 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa ON  L1G 4S4
Phone Number: (289) 316-1715


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Prince Edward Island

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 10 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARK JOAQUIM JULIUS D'SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SOUZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012