skip to content

D'Souza, David Joseph Arnold

CPSO#: 100502

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Chronic Pain Clinic
1939 Kennedy Road, Unit 105
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Phone: 416-364-4052
Fax: 416-364-4423 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

SCHC-Palliative Care Division
2660 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 2S3
Canada
Phone: (416) 847-4111
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

HearthStone Clinic
111 Simcoe Street North, Unit 100
(back entrance)
Oshawa ON  L1G 4S4
Canada
Phone: 289-316-1715
Fax: 289-316-1647
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Oshawa Chronic Pain Clinic
111 Simcoe St N
Unit 100 (Front Entrance)
Oshawa ON  L1G 4S4
Canada
Phone: 289-316-1645
Fax: 416-364-1166
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

True Davidson Acres
200 Dawes Road
Toronto ON  M4C 5M8
Canada
Phone: 4163970400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David J.A. D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. D'Souza ( CPSO# 100502)

Business Address:
Suite 105
1939 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Phone Number: (416) 364-4052

Business Address:
590 Oshawa Boulevard North
Oshawa ON  L1G 5T9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1777

Business Address:
200 Dawes Road
Toronto ON  M4C 5M8

Business Address:
Suite 100
111 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa ON  L1G 4S4

Business Address:
2660 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 2S3
Phone Number: (416) 847-4111


Corporation Name: Subhra Mohapatra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. D'Souza ( CPSO# 100502)
Dr. S. Mohapatra ( CPSO# 100565)
Dr. K. Efala ( CPSO# 80319 )
Dr. H. Jeyaraj ( CPSO# 86403 )
Dr. M. D'Souza ( CPSO# 91147 )

Business Address:
Myo Medical MD
G1
145 Front Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 364-4052

Business Address:
Suite 105
1939 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Phone Number: (416) 412-0505


Corporation Name: Dr. D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. D'Souza ( CPSO# 100502)
Dr. S. Mohapatra ( CPSO# 100565)
Dr. K. Efala ( CPSO# 80319 )
Dr. M. D'Souza ( CPSO# 91147 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
111 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa ON  L1G 4S4
Phone Number: (289) 316-1715

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID JOSEPH ARNOLD D'SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SOUZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2015 to 20 Dec 2015
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016