skip to content

D'Silva, Karen Annette

CPSO#: 86251

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Geriatrics
Elders Clinic, 4-002 Shuter
30 Bond Street
St. Michael's Hospital
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5015
Fax: (416) 864-5735 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Karen D'Silva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. D'Silva ( CPSO# 86251 )

Business Address:
Division of Geriatrics
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
4 Shuter Room 002
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAREN ANNETTE D'SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SILVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011