skip to content

D'Sa, Ryan A

CPSO#: 86665

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leicester, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NHS - St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 44572
Fax: (905) 6841468 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Greater Niagara General Hospital
Niagara Health System
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 53411
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Welland County General Hospital
Niagara Health System
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Canada
Phone: 9053784647 Ext. 33362
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ryan D'Sa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. D'Sa ( CPSO# 86665 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
St Catharines ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 5X9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RYAN A D'SA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2012