skip to content

D'Ovidio, Vincenzo

CPSO#: 18549

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Bologna, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 416 398 0638 Fax: 416 398 5932 Toll Free: 1 888 563 3732
Date Received: 08 Jul 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1962
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2014
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015