skip to content

D'Aragon, Frederick

CPSO#: 98757

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:26 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 8 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 26 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 8 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016