skip to content

DA Samy, Santhi Prema Priya

CPSO#: 86817

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 May 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 May 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malay, Tamil

Education:Universiti Sains Malaysia, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
438,Park Ave W
Chatham ON  N7M 1X2
Phone: (519) 354-1200
Fax: (519) 354-1208 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chatham Kent Health Alliance
Department of Otolaryngology
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 352-6400
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: DA Samy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. DA Samy ( CPSO# 86817 )

Business Address:
438 Park Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 1X2
Phone Number: (519) 354-1200


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Malaysia
Northwest Territories
Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:01 Jan 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANTHI PREMA PRIYA DA SAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DA SAMY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
International Specialist Physician - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2009