skip to content

Zlochower, Dovid Binyomin

CPSO#: 92226

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Oct 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Oct 2009
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tel Aviv University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010
Corporation Name: Zlochower Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Zlochower ( CPSO# 92226 )

Business Address:
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011 Active
             Dr.  Dovid  Binyomin  Zlochower  may  practise medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.