skip to content

Zeldin, David Andrew

CPSO#: 97361

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Yorkview Medical Centre
3695 Keele Street
North York ON  M3J 1N2
Phone: (416) 633-3711
Fax: (416) 633-0521 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Athlete's Care
5095 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M2N 6Z4
Canada
Phone: (416) 479-8685
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

205 Cummer Ave
Toronto ON  M2M 2E8
Canada
Phone: 416 392-9500
Fax: 416-392-9499
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert Allan Zeldin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Zeldin ( CPSO# 97361 )
Dr. R. Zeldin ( CPSO# 29961 )

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-0109

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 501-3565

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW ZELDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZELDIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 19 Mar 2012 to 31 Mar 2012
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2013