skip to content

Yim, Daniel

CPSO#: 59309

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1989

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University Of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
78 Finch Avenue East
North York ON  M2N 7J5
Phone: (416) 222-5057 Ext. 23
Fax: (416) 222-8009 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. Yim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yim ( CPSO# 59309 )

Business Address:
78 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 7J5
Phone Number: (416) 222-5057

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIEL YIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989