skip to content

Vilis, Donna Mary

CPSO#: 29546

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Aug 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 160
Pakenham ON  K0A 2X0
Phone: (613) 624-5480
Fax: (613) 624-5223 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vilis Kiskis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 27 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DONNA MARY VILIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1977