skip to content

Tse, Darren Patrick Chun Yin

CPSO#: 88363

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nottingham, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
737 Parkdale Ave
Parkdale Clinic Room 268
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13360
Fax: (613) 667-2899 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Darren Tse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tse ( CPSO# 88363 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Parkdale
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
F - 530 Fred Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-3774

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DARREN PATRICK CHUN YIN TSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013