skip to content

Toubassi, Diana

CPSO#: 84716

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Family Health Team
Room 2W428
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5888 Ext. 1
Fax: (416) 603-5448 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Frost Toubassi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Toubassi ( CPSO# 84716 )
Dr. D. Frost ( CPSO# 84656 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Room 8E 424
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
339 Bathurst Street
8E-428
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DIANA TOUBASSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOUBASSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.