skip to content

Toguri, Daniel Kazuhiko

CPSO#: 96418

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Apr 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
unit 1, room 302
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: 416 535-8501 Ext. 30960 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Allan Toguri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Toguri ( CPSO# 22871 )
Dr. D. Toguri ( CPSO# 96418 )
Dr. C. Toguri ( CPSO# 103708)

Business Address:
Suite 411
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 439-8913

Business Address:
200 - 2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: (416) 296-1911


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIEL KAZUHIKO TOGURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOGURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2018