skip to content

Southcott, Daphne Nina

CPSO#: 110997

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Oct 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1465 Richmond St
London ON  N6G 2M1
Phone: 519-661-2111 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Elizabeth Hooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Southcott ( CPSO# 110997)
Dr. E. Hooper ( CPSO# 50793 )
Dr. J. Southcott ( CPSO# 31853 )

Business Address:
Leamington Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-2501

Business Address:
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1K7
Phone Number: (519) 256-4358

Business Address:
10 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 979-0111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAPHNE NINA SOUTHCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUTHCOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 18 Oct 2016 to 10 Jan 2017
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 17 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 17 Oct 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2018