skip to content

Snider, Donald David

CPSO#: 52670

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 May 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 May 1990

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
716 Dundas St., Unit B
Woodstock ON  N4S 1E7
Phone: (519) 533-0865
Fax: (519) 533-0947 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tillsonburg District Memorial Hosp
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (519) 842-3611
Fax: (519) 842-2048
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4210
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David Snider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Snider ( CPSO# 52670 )

Business Address:
476 Peel Street
3rd Floor
Woodstock ON  N4S 1K1
Phone Number: (519) 533-0865

Business Address:
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Business Address:
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:01 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DONALD DAVID SNIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNIDER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1990