skip to content

Schiff, David Peter Edward

CPSO#: 26495

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Aug 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph Medical Imaging
54 Cardigan St.
N1H3Z6
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone: 226-314-0778
Fax: 519-763-8242 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David P. Schiff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Schiff ( CPSO# 26495 )

Business Address:
Guelph Medical Imaging
54 Cardigan Street
Guelph ON  N1H 3Z6

Business Address:
Guelph Medical Imaging
Suite 11-12
33 Farley Drive
Guelph ON  N1L 0B7

Business Address:
103 - 83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 767-0550

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID PETER EDWARD SCHIFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIFF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 May 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1978