First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jan 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2021 |