skip to content

Ponesse, David John Anthony

CPSO#: 19494

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Mar 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 1983

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1309 Yonge Street
Box 968
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Phone: (519) 881-1200
Fax: (519) 881-1201 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Ponesse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ponesse ( CPSO# 19494 )

Business Address:
1309 Yonge Street
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Phone Number: (519) 881-1200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN ANTHONY PONESSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PONESSE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jan 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1983