skip to content

Ogilvie-Harris, Darrell Justice

CPSO#: 29711

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Nov 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
1E47 New East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5862
Fax: (416) 603-4376 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Darrell Ogilvie-Harris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ogilvie-Harris ( CPSO# 29711 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
1E47 - 399 Bathurst Street
New East Wing
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5862


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DARRELL JUSTICE OGILVIE-HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGILVIE-HARRIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1977