skip to content

Nahon, Dahlia Ruth

CPSO#: 81227

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone: (416) 787-9796
Fax: (416) 787-8094 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hotz Sidlofsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sidlofsky ( CPSO# 76781 )
Dr. S. Nusinowitz ( CPSO# 30834 )
Dr. P. Freedman ( CPSO# 23615 )
Dr. S. Colla ( CPSO# 24624 )
Dr. S. Gottesman ( CPSO# 56767 )
Dr. M. Gelkopf ( CPSO# 60783 )
Dr. A. Hotz ( CPSO# 67906 )
Dr. D. Pankowski ( CPSO# 84291 )
Dr. D. Nahon ( CPSO# 81227 )
Dr. S. Kraus ( CPSO# 104638)
Dr. R. Feldman ( CPSO# 50541 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-2776


Corporation Name: Dahlia Ruth Nahon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nahon ( CPSO# 81227 )

Business Address:
101 - 491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-9796

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact: 491 Lawrence Avenue West, Suite 101, Toronto, ON, M5M 1C7. Tel: 416-787-9796
Date Received: 29 May 2019

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAHLIA RUTH NAHON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAHON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2006 to 23 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2007