skip to content

Murthy, Deepak

CPSO#: 111672

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Mar 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Pune, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rajni Bhatia and Dr. Deepak MurthyMedicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Crassweller ( CPSO# 11672 )
Dr. R. Bhatia ( CPSO# 100413)
Dr. D. Murthy ( CPSO# 111672)

Business Address:
450 Blanche St
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0

Business Address:
20-2891 Old Lakeshore Rd
Bright's Grove ON  N0N 1C0


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Dec 2019 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEEPAK MURTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 23 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2019 to 22 Sep 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2020