skip to content

Lipszyc, Deborah Hannah

CPSO#: 103281

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
305-745 Mount Pleasant Rd
Toronto ON  M4S 2N4
Phone: (416) 487-2052
Fax: (416) 480-2030 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 305
745 Mt. Pleasant Rd.
Toronto ON  M4S 2N4
Canada
Phone: (416) 487-2052
Fax: (416) 480-2030
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Oren Steen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Steen ( CPSO# 90537 )
Dr. D. Lipszyc ( CPSO# 103281)

Business Address:
LMC Diabetes & Endocrinology
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 645-2929

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Mar 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEBORAH HANNAH LIPSZYC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPSZYC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 01 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 27 Mar 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2018