skip to content

Linda, Dorota

CPSO#: 84615

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Room 570
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5592 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dorota Linda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Linda ( CPSO# 84615 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2381

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DOROTA LINDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012