skip to content

Gurau, David Aaron

CPSO#: 96268

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Suite 400
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: 289-357-0100
Fax: 289-357-0101 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Gurau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rockman ( CPSO# 100426)
Dr. D. Gurau ( CPSO# 96268 )

Business Address:
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone Number: (905) 634-4440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID AARON GURAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GURAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 04 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

McMaster University, 05 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016