skip to content

Gilmour, Darren James

CPSO#: 100637

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Haliburton Highlands FHT
7217 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone: 705-457-1212 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Coles-Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bottum ( CPSO# 55581 )
Dr. C. Stephenson ( CPSO# 57052 )
Dr. K. Gammon ( CPSO# 58233 )
Dr. A. Conway ( CPSO# 61182 )
Dr. S. Coles ( CPSO# 68010 )
Dr. B. Armstrong ( CPSO# 68028 )
Dr. N. Thomas ( CPSO# 91096 )
Dr. J. Suke ( CPSO# 93397 )
Dr. D. Gilmour ( CPSO# 100637)

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
7217 Gelert Road
PO Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212


Corporation Name: Dr. Darren Gilmour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gilmour ( CPSO# 100637)

Business Address:
Haliburton Highlands FHT
7217 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DARREN JAMES GILMOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILMOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2015