skip to content

Feig, Denice Suzan

CPSO#: 50539

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Feb 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 1988

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lebovic Building Suite L5 027
Mailbox 14
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-8590
Fax: (416) 361-2657 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Lefkowitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lefkowitz ( CPSO# 32044 )
Dr. D. Feig ( CPSO# 50539 )
Dr. A. Lefkowitz ( CPSO# 101463)

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E4
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
837 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1L2
Phone Number: (416) 465-5464

Business Address:
650 Sammon Avenue
K Wing
Suite 403
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 778-0000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:12 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:08 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DENICE SUZAN FEIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEIG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1988