skip to content

Evans, David Harcombe

CPSO#: 21443

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jul 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of London, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Gospodarowicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Evans ( CPSO# 21443 )
Dr. M. Gospodarowicz ( CPSO# 25004 )

Business Address:
The Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 2K4
Phone Number: (416) 946-4421

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020