skip to content

Cool, Derek William

CPSO#: 95560

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
LHSC - Victoria Hospital, Rm C2-207
800 Commissioners Rd. East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500 Ext. 54965 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Valiulis Cool Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cool ( CPSO# 95560 )
Dr. A. Valiulis ( CPSO# 95565 )

Business Address:
320 Adelaide St S
Unit B
London ON  N5Z 3L2

Business Address:
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (581) 685-8500

Business Address:
Suite 201
510 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6C 0B2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEREK WILLIAM COOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016