skip to content

Bourgeois, Daniel Joseph

CPSO#: 54466

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jul 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1990

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Diagnostic Imaging
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5039
Fax: (705) 743-1713 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
Phone: 705 324 6111 Ext. 4322
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton Highlands Health Srvices
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Canada
Phone: (705) 457-1392
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06

126 Oliver Road
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Canada
Phone: (705) 653-1140 Ext. 2127
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bourgeois Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bourgeois ( CPSO# 54466 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Highlands Health Services
7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-2398

Business Address:
Haliburton Highlands Health Services
6 McPherson Street
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Phone Number: (705) 286-6384

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5039

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140


Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Aldis ( CPSO# 31600 )
Dr. D. Bourgeois ( CPSO# 54466 )
Dr. K. Millitz ( CPSO# 63758 )
Dr. R. Sobiera ( CPSO# 65094 )
Dr. W. Myint ( CPSO# 67814 )
Dr. M. Voros ( CPSO# 73634 )
Dr. P. Wilson ( CPSO# 74749 )
Dr. K. King ( CPSO# 78979 )
Dr. S. Harvie ( CPSO# 87296 )
Dr. B. Junqueira-Duarte ( CPSO# 93836 )
Dr. S. Zaheer ( CPSO# 95170 )
Dr. F. Abdelsayed ( CPSO# 100533)

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
Diagnostic Imaging Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5039

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-3111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Minden Hospital Site Minden
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIEL JOSEPH BOURGEOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURGEOIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1990