skip to content

Bonin, Denis Maurice

CPSO#: 58373

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jul 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
Department of Pathology
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: 705 759 3434 Ext. 7187 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bonin and Queen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tomczak-Bojarski ( CPSO# 73304 )
Dr. L. Widjanarko ( CPSO# 51679 )
Dr. S. Gaytan-Garcia Graham ( CPSO# 60547 )
Dr. J. Gonzalez Berjon ( CPSO# 102034)
Dr. B. Danielson ( CPSO# 93246 )
Dr. M. Queen ( CPSO# 51719 )
Dr. D. Bonin ( CPSO# 58373 )
Dr. B. Mitrovic ( CPSO# 91572 )
Dr. M. Ngae ( CPSO# 94283 )
Dr. R. McClure ( CPSO# 101763)

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100


Corporation Name: Dr. Denis Bonin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bonin ( CPSO# 58373 )
Dr. D. Bonin ( CPSO# 108555)

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 27 May 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DENIS MAURICE BONIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989