skip to content

Bhatt, Devendra Shankerprasad

CPSO#: 27142

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Dec 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:Makerere Univ, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
119 Memorial Avenue
suite 104 b
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: (705) 325-4414
Fax: (705) 330-0250 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

119 Memorial Ave
Suite 104 B
Orillia ON  L3V5X1
Canada
Phone: 705 325 4414
Fax: 705 330 0250
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Devendra S. Bhatt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bhatt ( CPSO# 27142 )

Business Address:
104B - 119 Memorial Avenue
Simcoe ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 325-4414

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEVENDRA SHANKERPRASAD BHATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1974
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.