skip to content

Ansell, Dominique Renee

CPSO#: 100182

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4790 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

344 Elgin Street
Sudbury ON  P3E3N9
Canada
Phone: (705) 673-3721
Fax: 7058053660
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

525 Causley St., P.O. Box 970
Blind River ON  P0R1B0
Canada
Phone: (705) 356-2265
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (705) 753-3110
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dominique R. Ansell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ansell ( CPSO# 100182)

Business Address:
Health Sciences North Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Shore Health Network Blind River

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 25 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DOMINIQUE RENEE ANSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.