skip to content

Czilli, Tiffany

CPSO#: 95814

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1210 Erie Street East
Windsor ON  N9A 3Z5
Phone: (519) 944-4449
Fax: 226-674-0778 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Czilli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Czilli ( CPSO# 95814 )

Business Address:
1210 Erie Street East
Windsor ON  N9A 3Z5
Phone Number: (519) 944-4449

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TIFFANY CZILLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZILLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 05 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 06 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014

Concerns

Source: Canadian Medical Regulatory Authorities
Active Date: October 21, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
The following are disciplinary findings made by other regulatory bodies against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On October 21, 2020, the Discipline Committee of the Ontario College of Pharmacists made findings of professional misconduct against Tiffany Czilli including, among other things, falsification of pharmacy records, signing or issuing in her professional capacity a document that she knew contained a false or misleading statement, submission of an account or charges for services that she knew was a false or misleading statement, and failure to keep required records. The Discipline Committee ordered the following: (a) that Dr. Czilli successfully complete the ProBE program, (b) suspension of Dr. Czilli’s pharmacist certificate for a period of 11-12 months (depending on completion of the ProBE program), (c) that Dr. Czilli is prohibited for a period of 3 years from acting as a designated manager of any pharmacy and from having a proprietary interest in any pharmacy, and (d) that Dr. Czilli be reprimanded.