skip to content

Czernikiewicz, Wojciech

CPSO#: 94401

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Czernikiewicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Czernikiewicz ( CPSO# 94401 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WOJCIECH CZERNIKIEWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZERNIKIEWICZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010