skip to content

Czarnecki, Jan Stanislaw Campbell

CPSO#: 21929

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jun 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jan S. Czarnecki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St Regis Cres S North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 15 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018