skip to content

Cyr, Jason Denis

CPSO#: 87188

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital - Wilson Site
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: JD Cyr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cyr ( CPSO# 87188 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
Wilson Site
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 360-8254

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JASON DENIS CYR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012