skip to content

Cypel, Tatiana Karine Simon

CPSO#: 86911

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 10 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2013