skip to content

Cypel, Marcelo

CPSO#: 86294

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Pontificia-Catolica Do Rio Grande Do Sul, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
200 Elizabeth Street
North Wing Room 9N 969
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5156
Fax: 416 3403478 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Marcelo Cypel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cypel ( CPSO# 86294 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
200 Elizabeth Street
North Wing Room 9N 969
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Thoracic Surgery Effective:01 Sep 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
General Surgery Effective:01 Sep 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Thoracic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Thoracic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Thoracic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Thoracic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2016 Active
             1.    Dr. Marcelo Cypel may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  Thoracic  Surgery, University of Toronto in which Dr.
                        Cypel  holds  an academic appointment  at  the  rank  of  Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires when Dr. Cypel no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.