skip to content

Cybulska, Paulina

CPSO#: 91340

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue, OPG Wing
6th Flr 6W-369
Toronto, ON M5G 2M9
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4043 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Cybulska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cybulska ( CPSO# 91340 )

Business Address:
700 University Avenue
6th Floor, Suite 6816
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 946-4043

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
OPG 6th Floor, Suite 6W-369
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Oncology Effective:25 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAULINA CYBULSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYBULSKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019