skip to content

Cy, Ajith

CPSO#: 89297

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Feb 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Chakkittakandiyil, Ajith (used until: 10 Apr 2014 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Calicut University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
135 Union Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 1C4
Phone: 519-579-8996
Fax: (519)579-7632 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ajith Cy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cy ( CPSO# 89297 )

Business Address:
135 Union Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 1C4
Phone Number: (647) 964-8375

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AJITH CY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 16 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015