skip to content

Cuthbert, David Anthony

CPSO#: 92267

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Nov 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Pennsylvania State University Coll of Me, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Walker Family Cancer Centre
1200 Fourth Ave.
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David Cuthbert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cuthbert ( CPSO# 92267 )

Business Address:
Walker Family Cancer Centre
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 682-6451

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID ANTHONY CUTHBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUTHBERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 16 Nov 2009 to 11 Dec 2009
EL - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2017