skip to content

Cutbush, Wesley Shier

CPSO#: 28365

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
140 Centennial Parkway N
Hamilton ON  L8E 1H9
Phone: (905) 561-9255 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Barrie Medical Clinics
Administration Office
829 Big Bay Point Road
Unit D12
Barrie ON  L4N 4E1
Canada
Phone: (705) 726-1544
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

880 UPPER WENTWORTH STREET
Hamilton ON  L9A5H2
Canada
Phone: 905-575-0808
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wesley Shier Cutbush Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 2 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WESLEY SHIER CUTBUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUTBUSH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2007