skip to content

Curuvija, Srdjan

CPSO#: 28771

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Sep 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, French, Serbian, Yugoslav

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Curuvija Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 5 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Monfort Hospital 713 Montreal Road Ottawa, Ontario K1K 0T2
Date Received: 26 May 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020