skip to content

Curts, Dustin Jonathan

CPSO#: 95468

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
920 1st Ave West
Suite 201
Owen Sound, ON CA
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K5
Phone: 226 664 9200 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Barrie Lasix
500 Huronia Road
Suite 204
Barrie ON  L4N 8X3
Canada
Phone: 705-797-1700
Fax: 705-797-1800
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Curts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Curts ( CPSO# 95468 )

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  M4K 5N3
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
920 1st Avenue West
Suite 201
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K5
Phone Number: (226) 664-9200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DUSTIN JONATHAN CURTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURTS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016