skip to content

Currie, Donald John

CPSO#: 12402

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1953 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1947
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1948
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1954
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002