skip to content

Curran, Scott Joseph

CPSO#: 100406

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Apartment 309
539 Armstrong Road
Kingston ON  K7M 0C6
Phone: (613) 876-7155 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St E, Belleville, ON
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St, Kingston
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: 613-549-6666
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Scott J. Curran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Curran ( CPSO# 100406)

Business Address:
309-539 Armstrong Road
Kingston ON  K7M 0C6
Phone Number: (613) 876-7155

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SCOTT JOSEPH CURRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017