skip to content

Cupido, Tracy Lynn

CPSO#: 87169

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:CHICAGO COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Chronic Pain Clinic, JM 3
Hotel Dieu Hospital, 166 Brock St
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tracy Cupido Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cupido ( CPSO# 87169 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology and Perioperative Me
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
HDH
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
QHC Belleville General Hospital
295 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
QHC Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 3X3
Phone Number: (613) 392-2540

Business Address:
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-1008

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:04 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TRACY LYNN CUPIDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUPIDO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 27 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 28 Oct 2011 to 27 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2013