skip to content

Cunningham, David George

CPSO#: 29403

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Nov 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Nov 2007
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1600 Scot St
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: (613) 614-3600 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1976 to 14 Jun 1977
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011 Active
             1.    Dr. David George Cunningham may practice in administrative medicine.

            2.    Dr. Cunningham shall not treat patients.