Cummins, Graham James (CPSO#: 100560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
801 St David St N
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Phone: (519) 843-4380
Fax: 519-843-3211
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

235 Union St E
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Canada
Phone: 518-843-2010
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graham Cummins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Cummins ( CPSO# 100560)

Business Address:
753 Tower Street South
Fergus ON  N1M 2R2
Phone Number: (519) 843-4380

Business Address:
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
801 St. David Street North
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Phone Number: (519) 787-2940

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Sep 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAHAM JAMES CUMMINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUMMINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 16 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2015